IN HB1609 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - First Reading: Referred to Committee on Education & Career Development
Pending: Senate Education and Career Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

State board of education. Provides that the members of the state board of education shall elect annually a chairperson from the members of the state board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State board of education. Provides that the members of the state board of education shall elect annually a chairperson from the members of the state board.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-09 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House - Amendment #2 (Pierce) failed (Y: 27 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-02-05 - House - House - Amendment #5 (Smith V) failed (Y: 27 N: 68 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-02-05 - House - House - Amendment #3 (Austin) failed (Y: 27 N: 68 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-02-05 - House - House - Amendment #16 (McMillin) prevailed (Y: 69 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House - Minority report (Austin) not substituted for majority report (Y: 28 N: 68 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-01-29 - House - House Committee on Education - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-24SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Committee on Education & Career Development
2015-02-10HouseReferred to the Senate
2015-02-09HouseSenator Holdman added as sponsor
2015-02-09HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 97: yeas 58, nays 40
2015-02-05HouseAmendment #2 (Pierce) failed; Roll Call 87: yeas 27, nays 69
2015-02-05HouseAmendment #5 (Smith V) failed; Roll Call 86: yeas 27, nays 68
2015-02-05HouseAmendment #3 (Austin) failed; Roll Call 85: yeas 27, nays 68
2015-02-05HouseAmendment #16 (McMillin) prevailed; Roll Call 84: yeas 70, nays 25
2015-02-05HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2015-02-02HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2015-02-02HouseMinority report (Austin) not substituted for majority report: Roll Call 57: yeas 28, nays 68
2015-01-29HouseRepresentative Morrison added as coauthor
2015-01-20HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Education
2015-01-20HouseCoauthored by Representative Wesco
2015-01-20HouseAuthored by Representative McMillin

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2015/bills/house/1609/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/7/0/5/77052a99/HB1609.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/4/1/5/f41552f9/HB1609.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/b/b/c/7bbce9f3/HB1609.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/2/d/d/c2dde4f7/HB1609.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/c/d/f/1cdfd96c/HB1609.03.ENGH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/4/a/6/44a6064a/HB1609.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/5/d/2/c5d23767/HB_1609.57.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/e/e/1/9ee17043/HB1609.84.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/4/e/c/c4ec48a8/HB1609.85.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/0/2/e/c02e736d/HB1609.86.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/d/d/5/7dd55637/HB1609.87.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/0/4/4/4044f62a/HB1609.97.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback