IN HB1607 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-05 - Public Law 266
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Harassment and orders for protection. Defines "harassment" for purposes of civil orders for protection. Provides that a person who is a victim of harassment may file a petition for an order for protection against a person who commits harassment, and that a court may issue an order for protection against a person who commits harassment only after notice and a hearing. Provides that a court may impose certain terms and conditions upon a respondent when allowing a petitioner and respondent to occupy the same location. Specifies the powers of magistrates. Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Harassment and orders for protection. Defines "harassment" for purposes of civil orders for protection. Provides that a person who is a victim of harassment may file a petition for an order for protection against a person who commits harassment, and that a court may issue an order for protection against a person who commits harassment only after notice and a hearing. Provides that a court may impose certain terms and conditions upon a respondent when allowing a petitioner and respondent to occupy the same location. Specifies the powers of magistrates. Makes conforming changes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-05HousePublic Law 266
2019-05-05HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-24SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-24HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-24SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 604: yeas 49, nays 0
2019-04-24HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 623: yeas 94, nays 0
2019-04-24SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2019-04-24HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2019-04-22HouseRepresentative Cook added as coauthor
2019-04-22HouseRule 105.1 suspended
2019-04-15SenateSenate advisors appointed: Ruckelshaus and Taylor G
2019-04-15SenateSenate conferees appointed: Head and Randolph Lonnie M
2019-04-15HouseHouse advisors appointed: Cook, Young J, Beck and Candelaria Reardon
2019-04-15HouseHouse conferees appointed: McNamara and Hatfield
2019-04-15HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2019-04-15HouseMotion to dissent filed
2019-04-12SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2019-04-11SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 446: yeas 45, nays 3
2019-04-09SenateSenator Ruckelshaus added as second sponsor
2019-04-09SenateAmendment #5 (Head) prevailed; voice vote
2019-04-09SenateAmendment #4 (Tallian) prevailed; voice vote
2019-04-09SenateAmendment #2 (Head) prevailed; voice vote
2019-04-09SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-03-19SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2019-03-19SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-07SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
2019-02-22HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-21HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Head
2019-02-21HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 260: yeas 97, nays 1
2019-02-20HouseAmendment #2 (Hatfield) prevailed; voice vote
2019-02-20HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-02-18HouseRepresentative Burton added as coauthor
2019-02-18HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-22HouseRepresentative Beck added as coauthor
2019-01-22HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-01-22HouseCoauthored by Representative Candelaria Reardon
2019-01-22HouseAuthored by Representative Hatfield

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1607/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/9/3/6/f936b847/HB1607.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/2/f/1/d2f1d792/HB1607.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/8/1/a/681a7c07/HB1607.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/8/4/8/884819dd/HB1607.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/2/4/9/b24903c2/HB1607.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/f/3/e/2f3ebd75/HB1607.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/c/1/3/2c13ea6f/HB1607.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/a/7/9/4a799bd3/HB1607.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/e/4/9/de49558b/HB1607.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/7/e/6/e7e6423e/HB1607.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/4/9/1/14915d15/HB1607.06.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/d/1/9/9d198f86/HB1607.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/1/3/6/71361e8e/HB1607.260.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/f/b/4/6fb4fce1/HB1607.03.ENGH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/1/8/6/c1863eb7/HB1607.446.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/1/c/1/d1c17f16/HB1607.623.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/f/1/5/ef15b7d6/HB1607.604.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback