IN HB1605 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-16 - Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Public defender participation in PARF. Adds a person who serves in one of the following positions on or after January 1, 2014, to the prosecuting attorneys retirement fund (PARF): (1) The state public defender or the second highest paid staff person employed by the state public defender. (2) The executive director of the public defender council of Indiana or the second highest paid staff person employed by the public defender council of Indiana. (3) The highest paid or the second highest paid staff person employed by the Indiana public defender commission. (4) A chief public defender or chief deputy public defender. Allows staff attorneys of the prosecuting attorneys council of Indiana employed on or after January 1, 2012, to participate in PARF. Changes the name of the prosecuting attorneys retirement fund to the prosecuting attorneys and public defenders retirement fund. Provides that after a participant has contributed to PARF for 22 years, the state or county shall pay the contributions to the fund for the participant. Provides that the computation of benefits is based in part on the highest salary that was paid to the participant before separation from service. Provides that 1% shall be added to the percentage used to calculate benefits for each year of service after 22 years. Provides that a reduced annual retirement benefit equals the benefit that would be payable if the participant were 65 years of age reduced by 0.10% for each month before the participant's sixty-fifth birthday. Allows a participant to receive service credit in PARF for more than one year and less than 10 years of service received by the participant in the public employees' retirement fund under certain conditions. Provides for the calculation of an offset of PARF benefits payable to a participant from a participant's public employees' retirement fund benefits based on the concurrent service and wages the participant earned in both the public employees' retirement fund and PARF. Makes corresponding changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public defender participation in PARF.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-20 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-16SenateCommittee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
2023-03-13SenateSenator Pol added as cosponsor
2023-03-09SenateSenator Niezgodski added as cosponsor
2023-03-06SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor
2023-02-21HouseReferred to the Senate
2023-02-20HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Freeman, Rogers, Glick
2023-02-20HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 156: yeas 94, nays 1
2023-02-16HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2023-02-14HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2023-02-02HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
2023-02-02HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2023-01-19HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
2023-01-19HouseAuthored by Representative VanNatter
2023-01-19HouseCoauthored by Representatives McNamara and Hatfield

Subjects


Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback