IN HB1605 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Public Law 14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Department of transportation matters. Removes a provision requiring each contract for highway work to be acknowledged before an officer authorized to administer oaths. Provides that a certificate of qualification issued by the department of transportation (department) is valid for a period of 24 months. Allows the department to adopt rules concerning eligibility and qualification requirements for bidders of contracts. Exempts the department from certain real property recording requirements. Makes conforming amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of transportation matters. Removes a provision requiring each contract for highway work to be acknowledged before an officer authorized to administer oaths. Provides that a certificate of qualification issued by the department of transportation (department) is valid for a period of 24 months. Allows the department to adopt rules concerning eligibility and qualification requirements for bidders of contracts. Exempts the department from certain real property recording requirements. Makes conforming amendments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HousePublic Law 14
2019-04-03HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-01SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-03-28SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-03-28HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-03-26SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2019-03-25SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 314: yeas 46, nays 0
2019-03-21SenateSenator Doriot added as second sponsor
2019-03-21SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-03-19SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-02-27SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
2019-02-01HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-01-31HouseRepresentative Forestal added as coauthor
2019-01-31HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Crider
2019-01-31HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 81: yeas 95, nays 0
2019-01-28HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-01-24HouseRepresentative Soliday added as coauthor
2019-01-24HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-01-22HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
2019-01-22HouseCoauthored by Representative Speedy
2019-01-22HouseAuthored by Representative Sullivan

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1605/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/e/f/7/8ef7142a/HB1605.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/b/7/f/bb7f4ce2/HB1605.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/e/5/6/5e569617/HB1605.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/d/d/d/bdddbe9f/HB1605.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/5/e/4/65e4e9b1/HB1605.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/d/6/e/cd6e6af6/HB1605.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/b/4/7/8b475738/HB1605.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/3/3/d/733d4154/HB1605.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/4/d/4/64d47767/HB1605.81.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/7/3/c/f73c61a6/HB1605.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/8/b/8/78b8baf8/HB1605.314.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback