IN HB1605 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-12 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-12 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Tax credit for medical device manufacturers. Provides a tax credit against adjusted gross income tax liability for taxpayers who: (1) are subject to the federal medical device excise tax; and (2) receive certification of a credit amount from the Indiana economic development corporation based on the taxpayer's creation or retention of jobs in Indiana. Provides that the tax credit: (1) applies to taxable years after December 31, 2014, and before January 1, 2017; (2) may not be awarded after the date on which the federal medical device excise tax is repealed or expires under the Internal Revenue Code; and (3)
Title
Tax credit for medical device manufacturers. Provides a tax credit against adjusted gross income tax liability for taxpayers who: (1) are subject to the federal medical device excise tax; and (2) receive certification of a credit amount from the Indiana economic development corporation based on the taxpayer's creation or retention of jobs in Indiana. Provides that the tax credit: (1) applies to taxable years after December 31, 2014, and before January 1, 2017; (2) may not be awarded after the date on which the federal medical device excise tax is repealed or expires under the Internal Revenue Code; and (3)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-11 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2015-02-12 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-02-02 | House | Representative Heaton added as coauthor |
2015-01-22 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Commerce, Small Business and Economic Development |
2015-01-22 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Hale and Austin |
2015-01-22 | House | Authored by Representative Smaltz |