IN HB1602 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Voids the 2001 congressional district plan adopted by the redistricting commission. Repeals the 1991 congressional district plan.
Title
Establishes the 2011 Indiana congressional district plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-28 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 62 N: 32 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 61 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 61 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-16 | Effective 07/01/2011 | |
2011-05-16 | Public Law 215 | |
2011-05-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-04 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-04-29 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2011-04-29 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2011-04-28 | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 688: yeas 62, nays 32 | |
2011-04-27 | Senator Lawson added as third sponsor | |
2011-04-27 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2011-04-27 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 479: yeas 37 and nays 12 | |
2011-04-26 | Senator M. Young added as second sponsor | |
2011-04-26 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-04-25 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-04-20 | First reading: referred to Committee on Elections | |
2011-04-20 | Representative Bartlett removed as coauthor | |
2011-04-20 | Senate sponsor: Senator Landske | |
2011-04-20 | Referred to the Senate | |
2011-04-20 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 593: yeas 61, nays 37 | |
2011-04-19 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-04-15 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-04-05 | Representatives Richardson and Bartlett added as coauthors | |
2011-04-05 | Representative Koch added as author | |
2011-02-17 | Reassigned to Committee on Elections and Apportionment | |
2011-02-17 | Rules suspended | |
2011-01-20 | First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures |