IN HB1601 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Public Law 259
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Certified technology parks. Requires that a certified technology park be recertified every three years beginning January 1, 2018. (Under current law, a certified technology park is required to be recertified every four years.) Requires the Indiana economic development corporation (IEDC), in conjunction with the office of management and budget (OMB), to develop metrics for measuring the performance of a certified technology park during a review period. Requires the IEDC to consult with local units of government in developing the metrics. Requires the metrics to include: (1) the criteria to be used to analyze and evaluate each category of information furnished

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Certified technology parks. Requires that a certified technology park be recertified every three years beginning January 1, 2018. (Under current law, a certified technology park is required to be recertified every four years.) Requires the Indiana economic development corporation (IEDC), in conjunction with the office of management and budget (OMB), to develop metrics for measuring the performance of a certified technology park during a review period. Requires the IEDC to consult with local units of government in developing the metrics. Requires the metrics to include: (1) the criteria to be used to analyze and evaluate each category of information furnished

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-10 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28HousePublic Law 259
2017-04-28HouseSigned by the Governor
2017-04-25SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2017-04-20SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2017-04-19HouseSigned by the Speaker
2017-04-10HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 444: yeas 93, nays 0
2017-04-06HouseMotion to concur filed
2017-03-31SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2017-03-30SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 332: yeas 49, nays 0
2017-03-28SenateAmendment #1 (Hershman) prevailed; voice vote
2017-03-28SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-03-27SenateSenator Messmer added as second sponsor
2017-03-20SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2017-03-20SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2017-02-23SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology
2017-02-17HouseReferred to the Senate
2017-02-16HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Hershman
2017-02-16HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 143: yeas 87, nays 0
2017-02-13HouseRepresentative Macer added as coauthor
2017-02-13HouseRepresentatives Morris and Cherry added as coauthors
2017-02-13HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2017-02-09HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2017-01-23HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Commerce, Small Business and Economic Development
2017-01-23HouseAuthored by Representative Huston

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2017/bills/house/1601/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/4/0/7/f4074da6/HB1601.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/6/b/e/46be9d00/HB1601.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/d/0/7/5d07e584/HB1601.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/5/9/b/f59b4a30/HB1601.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/8/2/0/b8200cae/HB1601.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/9/6/8/b968255d/HB1601.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/c/7/a/8c7a2938/HB1601.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/d/d/e/6ddeeee1/HB1601.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/1/0/7/8107d043/HB1601.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/8/8/8/f8888224/HB1601.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/f/c/6/dfc6e32b/HB1601.143.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/5/8/f/458f16e9/HB1601.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/b/3/8/0b38fd77/HB1601.332.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/b/6/0/5b607717/HB1601.444.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback