IN HB1600 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Public Law 60
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Public Law 60
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Study committee on protection of senior citizens. Urges the legislative council to assign to an appropriate interim study committee the task of studying certain issues concerning elder care.
Title
Study committee on protection of senior citizens. Urges the legislative council to assign to an appropriate interim study committee the task of studying certain issues concerning elder care.
Sponsors
Rep. Melanie Wright [D] | Rep. Vanessa Summers [D] | Rep. David Frizzell [R] | Rep. John Young [R] |
Sen. Timothy Lanane [D] | Sen. Ronald Grooms [R] | Sen. J.D. Ford [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Public Law 60 |
2019-04-18 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2019-04-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 357: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senator Ford J.D. added as cosponsor |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senator Grooms added as second sponsor |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2019-02-27 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services |
2019-02-05 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2019-02-04 | House | Representatives Summers, Frizzell, Young J added as coauthors |
2019-02-04 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Lanane |
2019-02-04 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 93: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2019-01-31 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-01-29 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-01-22 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs |
2019-01-22 | House | Authored by Representative Wright |