IN HB1597 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Public Law 91
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Campaign finance reports. Requires candidates for legislative offices to file campaign finance reports electronically.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Campaign finance reports. Requires candidates for legislative offices to file campaign finance reports electronically.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Reread third time (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 23 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - Third reading (Y: 82 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24HousePublic Law 91
2019-04-24HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-23SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-03SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-02HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-03-28SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2019-03-26SenateSenators Rogers and Raatz added as cosponsors
2019-03-26SenateReread third time: passed; Roll Call 317: yeas 32, nays 16
2019-03-25SenateThird reading: failed for lack of constitutional majority; Roll Call 313: yeas 23, nays 23
2019-03-21SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2019-03-21SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-03-19SenateSenator Grooms added as second sponsor
2019-03-18SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-03-07SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Elections
2019-02-13HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-12HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Walker
2019-02-12HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 150: yeas 82, nays 10
2019-02-11HouseRepresentatives Wesco and Moseley added as coauthors
2019-02-11HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-07HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-01-22HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment
2019-01-22HouseAuthored by Representative Mayfield

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1597/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/8/a/a/38aa34d4/HB1597.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/7/b/7/07b74910/HB1597.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/b/4/4/4b448366/HB1597.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/1/c/f/d1cf954f/HB1597.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/b/1/b/eb1b4609/HB1597.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/9/0/9/5909922c/HB1597.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/9/4/3/6943c2f4/HB1597.01.INTR.03.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/b/2/3/db23e785/HB1597.150.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/d/e/0/2de02bea/HB1597.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/4/e/a/34ea3ce1/HB1597.313.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/a/9/e/5a9ecb06/HB1597.317.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback