IN HB1590 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Public Law 245
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Public Law 245
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Various education matters. Makes various changes to the education law concerning the following: (1) The science of reading and licensing requirements. (2) The grant for benchmark, formative, interim, or similar assessments with regards to certain assessments, including universal screeners that screen for dyslexia. (3) Eligibility requirements for the next level computer science program. (4) Reading deficiency remediation plan requirements. (5) Payments and funding for excess costs of educating certain students with disabilities. (6) The use of funds from the Senator David C. Ford educational technology fund. (7) Requirements for public schools regarding adopting or replacing data technology systems. (8) The evaluation of curricular materials by the department of education (department). Requires the department to evaluate, approve, and publish a list of high quality curricular materials in the subjects of science, technology, engineering, and math. Provides that, before curricular material is included on the list, the publisher of the curricular material must enter into a data share agreement with the department. Requires, not later than July 1, 2024, the department to conduct a statewide survey to determine which curricular materials have been adopted for use in certain subjects.
Title
Various education matters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - House - House - Amendment #3 (Porter) failed (Y: 29 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-04-25 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - House - House - Amendment #3 (Porter) failed (Y: 29 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | House | Public Law 245 |
2023-05-04 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2023-05-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 485: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2023-04-25 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 494: yeas 85, nays 0 |
2023-04-24 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2023-04-24 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Ford J.D. and Rogers |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Raatz and Hunley |
2023-04-20 | House | House advisors appointed: Payne, Wesco and Pfaff |
2023-04-20 | House | House conferees appointed: Behning and Klinker |
2023-04-20 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2023-04-20 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 450: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Raatz) prevailed; voice vote |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Freeman) prevailed; voice vote |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-03-01 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2023-02-22 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2023-02-21 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Raatz and Rogers |
2023-02-21 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 194: yeas 90, nays 0 |
2023-02-20 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2023-02-20 | House | Amendment #3 (Porter) failed; Roll Call 163: yeas 29, nays 68 |
2023-02-20 | House | Amendment #2 (Behning) prevailed; voice vote |
2023-02-16 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-01-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2023-01-26 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2023-01-26 | House | Representative Klinker added as coauthor |
2023-01-19 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2023-01-19 | House | Authored by Representative Behning |
Subjects
EDUCATION, Secretary of Education, State Department and Boards
SCHOOLS, Choice Scholarships
SCHOOLS, Curricula
SCHOOLS, Funds and Budgets
SCHOOLS, Choice Scholarships
SCHOOLS, Curricula
SCHOOLS, Funds and Budgets