IN HB1588 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Public Law 286
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Insurance matters. Requires a pharmacy benefit manager doing business in Indiana to, at least every seven days, update and make available to pharmacies maximum allowable cost list information. Repeals the law providing for availability of high risk property coverage under the federal Urban Property Protection and Reinsurance Act of 1968. Exempts flood insurance policies from the kinds of policies under which mine subsidence coverage must be made available. Repeals the law concerning the small employer voluntary reinsurance program. Urges the legislative council to assign to an interim study committee the topic of regulation and practice of pharmacy benefit managers for study and recommendations during the 2019 interim of the general assembly. Makes conforming amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance matters. Requires a pharmacy benefit manager doing business in Indiana to, at least every seven days, update and make available to pharmacies maximum allowable cost list information. Repeals the law providing for availability of high risk property coverage under the federal Urban Property Protection and Reinsurance Act of 1968. Exempts flood insurance policies from the kinds of policies under which mine subsidence coverage must be made available. Repeals the law concerning the small employer voluntary reinsurance program. Urges the legislative council to assign to an interim study committee the topic of regulation and practice of pharmacy benefit managers for study and recommendations during the 2019 interim of the general assembly. Makes conforming amendments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06HousePublic Law 286
2019-05-06HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-29SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-29HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-24HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 633: yeas 97, nays 0
2019-04-24SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 613: yeas 49, nays 0
2019-04-24SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2019-04-24HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2019-04-18SenateSenate advisors appointed: Gaskill and Breaux
2019-04-18SenateSenate conferees appointed: Bassler and Ford J.D.
2019-04-18HouseHouse advisors appointed: Lehman, Borders and Campbell
2019-04-18HouseHouse conferees appointed: Carbaugh and Austin
2019-04-17HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2019-04-17HouseMotion to dissent filed
2019-04-17SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2019-04-16SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 500: yeas 49, nays 0
2019-04-11SenateAmendment #1 (Bohacek) prevailed; voice vote
2019-04-11SenateReread second time: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-04-09SenatePlaced back on second reading
2019-04-08SenateSenator Tallian added as cosponsor
2019-04-08SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-04-04SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions
2019-02-08HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-07HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Bassler
2019-02-07HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 118: yeas 96, nays 0
2019-02-04HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-01-31HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-22HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Insurance
2019-01-22HouseAuthored by Representative Carbaugh

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1588/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/0/4/1/1041436e/HB1588.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/3/7/4/b3749a08/HB1588.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/6/6/c/366cbbeb/HB1588.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/c/a/8/dca86926/HB1588.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/a/2/c/fa2c9214/HB1588.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/3/f/f/f3ff7a86/HB1588.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/4/b/e/e4be60c2/HB1588.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/c/0/e/dc0e4ecb/HB1588.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/b/9/1/cb91d598/HB1588.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/4/a/1/04a17d51/HB1588.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/0/9/d/109d1fb4/HB1588.118.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/9/4/d/994d98e9/HB1588.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/a/8/3/ca83b1a2/HB1588.500.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/6/8/0/c6805301/HB1588.613.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/f/c/1/efc11071/HB1588.633.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback