IN HB1583 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-31 - First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
Pending: Senate Tax and Fiscal Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-31 - First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
Pending: Senate Tax and Fiscal Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the credit for excessive residential property taxes and the following property tax deductions are to be allowed in the year of a property transfer if the property is determined to be exempt in the year following the transfer year: (1) Homestead standard deduction. (2) Homestead supplemental deduction. (3) Mortgage deduction. (4) Deduction for persons 65 or older. (5) Deduction for veterans with a partial disability. (6) Deduction for totally disabled veterans or veterans age 62 and partially disabled. (7) Deduction for surviving spouses of veterans. (8) Deduction for World War I veterans. (9) Deduction for rehabilitated residential real property. (10) Deduction for rehabilitated property.
Title
Exempt property eligibility for deductions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-28 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-31 | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy | |
2011-03-28 | Senate sponsors: Senators Walker and Holdman | |
2011-03-28 | Referred to the Senate | |
2011-03-28 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 278: yeas 97, nays 1 | |
2011-02-21 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-02-17 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2011-02-15 | Representative Klinker added as coauthor | |
2011-01-20 | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means | |
2011-01-20 | Coauthored by Representative M. Smith | |
2011-01-20 | Authored by Representative Clere |