IN HB1582 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-31 - First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions
Pending: Senate Insurance & Financial Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-31 - First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions
Pending: Senate Insurance & Financial Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the interim study committee on insurance to study, during the 2011 interim of the general assembly, certain health care provider and health insurer issues.
Title
Health care insurance study committee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-30 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-31 | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions | |
2011-03-30 | Senate sponsors: Senators Buck and Charbonneau | |
2011-03-30 | Referred to the Senate | |
2011-03-30 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 361: yeas 92, nays 3 | |
2011-02-21 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-02-17 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-20 | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance | |
2011-01-20 | Coauthored by Representative C. Brown | |
2011-01-20 | Authored by Representative VanNatter |