IN HB1578 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-01 - First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology
Pending: Senate Commerce & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Tobacco use. Repeals employment protections for individuals who smoke cigarettes or use other tobacco products.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tobacco use. Repeals employment protections for individuals who smoke cigarettes or use other tobacco products.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 54 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-01SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology
2017-02-28HouseReferred to the Senate
2017-02-27HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Brown L
2017-02-27HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 244: yeas 54, nays 38
2017-02-23HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2017-02-21HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-02-02HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
2017-02-02HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-01-23HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2017-01-23HouseCoauthored by Representatives Ziemke and Brown C
2017-01-23HouseAuthored by Representative Kirchhofer

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback