IN HB1577 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Public Law 218
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Public Law 218
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Abortion matters. Adds mental health providers to the list of persons who may not be required to participate in specified procedures and practices concerning abortion or aborted remains if the mental health provider objects to such procedures and practices on the basis of ethical, moral, or religious belief. Provides that an abortion inducing drug may not be dispensed, prescribed, or given to a woman after eight weeks of postfertilization age. Requires a physician to dispense the abortion inducing drug in person and have the pregnant woman consume the drug in the presence of the physician. Removes FDA guidelines from a provision concerning manufacturer instruction sheets and patient agreement forms pertaining to abortion inducing drugs. Requires an ultrasound image of a pregnant woman's fetus to be provided: (1) to a pregnant woman for her to keep; and (2) at no cost or charge to the pregnant woman; in the event of fetal ultrasound imaging. Requires certain information concerning the reversal of specified abortion inducing drugs to be provided to a pregnant woman in certain instances. Requires a specified report to identify the: (1) facility; and (2) city or town; where required information concerning an abortion was provided. Requires specified individuals to include, or to ensure the inclusion of, a copy of a pregnant woman's ultrasound report in the applicable patient file. Prohibits an abortion clinic from receiving an annual license renewal if ultrasound reports are not included in a pregnant woman's patient file. Provides that the written parental consent for purposes of abortion laws concerning an unemancipated pregnant woman less than 18 years of age must be notarized. Prohibits the state department of health from renewing an abortion clinic's license if noncompliance discovered during an annual inspection is not remedied. Prohibits the use of telemedicine to provide any abortion, including the writing or filling of a prescription for any purpose that is intended to result in an abortion. Defines certain terms. Makes conforming amendments.
Title
Abortion matters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 63 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #6 (Breaux) failed (Y: 11 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #5 (Breaux) failed (Y: 9 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #4 (Breaux) failed (Y: 11 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #3 (Yoder) failed (Y: 10 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #2 (Yoder) failed (Y: 12 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #1 (Yoder) failed (Y: 12 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 67 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #6 (Breaux) failed (Y: 11 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #5 (Breaux) failed (Y: 9 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #4 (Breaux) failed (Y: 11 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #3 (Yoder) failed (Y: 10 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #2 (Yoder) failed (Y: 12 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #1 (Yoder) failed (Y: 12 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 67 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | House | Public Law 218 |
2021-04-29 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2021-04-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2021-04-14 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 441: yeas 63, nays 25 |
2021-04-12 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Senator Raatz added as cosponsor |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as cosponsor |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Senator Buck added as cosponsor |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 363: yeas 36, nays 14 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Senator Tomes added as cosponsor |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Amendment #6 (Breaux) failed; Roll Call 334: yeas 11, nays 37 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Amendment #5 (Breaux) failed; Roll Call 333: yeas 9, nays 39 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Amendment #4 (Breaux) failed; Roll Call 332: yeas 11, nays 37 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Yoder) failed; Roll Call 331: yeas 10, nays 37 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Yoder) failed; Roll Call 330: yeas 12, nays 35 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Yoder) failed; Roll Call 329: yeas 12, nays 35 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Senator Gaskill added as cosponsor |
2021-03-08 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2021-02-23 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2021-02-22 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Brown L, Houchin, Rogers |
2021-02-22 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 213: yeas 67, nays 29 |
2021-02-17 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-02-15 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-01-14 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2021-01-14 | House | Coauthored by Representatives King and Davis |
2021-01-14 | House | Authored by Representative Mayfield |