IN HB1577 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-23 - First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-23 - First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
DNA samples of felony arrestees. Requires every person arrested for a felony after June 30, 2017, to submit a DNA sample, and specifies that the sample may be obtained only by buccal swab. Provides that a DNA sample may be obtained from a person arrested without a warrant for a felony, but that the DNA sample may not be shipped for DNA identification until a court has found probable cause for the felony arrest. Provides for the expungement of a DNA sample taken from a person if the person is acquitted of all felony charges, all felony charges are dismissed,
Title
DNA samples of felony arrestees. Requires every person arrested for a felony after June 30, 2017, to submit a DNA sample, and specifies that the sample may be obtained only by buccal swab. Provides that a DNA sample may be obtained from a person arrested without a warrant for a felony, but that the DNA sample may not be shipped for DNA identification until a court has found probable cause for the felony arrest. Provides for the expungement of a DNA sample taken from a person if the person is acquitted of all felony charges, all felony charges are dismissed,
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 81 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-23 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-22 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2017-02-21 | House | Representative Bosma added as coauthor |
2017-02-21 | House | Rule 105.1 suspended |
2017-02-21 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Houchin, Zakas and Merritt |
2017-02-21 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 185: yeas 81, nays 16 |
2017-02-20 | House | Amendment #1 (Steuerwald) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-02-20 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2017-02-13 | House | Representatives Olthoff, Cherry, Burton added as coauthors |
2017-02-13 | House | Rule 105.1 suspended |
2017-02-13 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-02-02 | House | Representatives Lehman and Schaibley added as coauthors |
2017-02-02 | House | Rule 105.1 suspended |
2017-01-30 | House | Representatives Bauer, McNamara, Goodin added as coauthors |
2017-01-26 | House | Representative Steuerwald added as author |
2017-01-26 | House | Representative Bauer removed as author |
2017-01-23 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-01-23 | House | Authored by Representative Bauer |