IN HB1568 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 118
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 118
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Real property subject to tax sale.
Title
Real property subject to tax sale.
Sponsors
Rep. Justin Moed [D] | Rep. Gail Riecken [D] | Rep. John Price [R] | Rep. Dennis Zent [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-16 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 84 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 84 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 118 |
2013-04-29 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-04-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-04-16 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 503: yeas 84, nays 0 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 379: yeas 48 and nays 0 |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Amendment 2 (Holdman), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-02-25 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions |
2013-02-19 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Holdman and Tallian |
2013-02-19 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2013-02-19 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 168: yeas 84, nays 6 |
2013-02-18 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-02-14 | House | Representatives Price and Zent added as coauthors |
2013-02-14 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-02-05 | House | Representative Riecken added as coauthor |
2013-02-05 | House | Representative Moed added as author |
2013-02-05 | House | Representative Riecken removed as author |
2013-01-22 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions |
2013-01-22 | House | Authored by Representative Riecken |