IN HB1565 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - First Reading: Referred to Committee on Commerce & Technology
Pending: Senate Commerce & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - First Reading: Referred to Committee on Commerce & Technology
Pending: Senate Commerce & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Energy savings audits. Allows the department of administration to assist state agencies in performing energy savings audits of state property. Allows a state agency to retain cost savings realized as a result of the audit in an amount not to exceed the cost of conducting the audit plus an additional amount not to exceed 10% of the cost of conducting the audit.
Title
Energy savings audits. Allows the department of administration to assist state agencies in performing energy savings audits of state property. Allows a state agency to retain cost savings realized as a result of the audit in an amount not to exceed the cost of conducting the audit plus an additional amount not to exceed 10% of the cost of conducting the audit.
Sponsors
Rep. Justin Moed [D] | Rep. Michael Karickhoff [R] | Rep. Heath VanNatter [R] | Rep. Sue Errington [D] |
Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] | Sen. Brent Waltz [R] | Sen. Mark Stoops [D] | Sen. John Broden [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-02 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Committee on Commerce & Technology |
2015-02-25 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-02-24 | House | Senator Broden added as cosponsor |
2015-02-24 | House | Senator Stoops added as third sponsor |
2015-02-24 | House | Senator Waltz added as second sponsor |
2015-02-24 | House | Senator Charbonneau added as sponsor |
2015-02-24 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 253: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2015-02-23 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-02-19 | House | Representative Errington added as coauthor |
2015-02-19 | House | Representative VanNatter added as coauthor |
2015-02-19 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-29 | House | Representative Karickhoff added as coauthor |
2015-01-20 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform |
2015-01-20 | House | Authored by Representative Moed |