IN HB1564 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 171
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 171
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a motorboat does not have to be registered and numbered in Indiana if the motorboat is legally registered in another state and is moored on the Indiana part of Lake Michigan for not more than 180 consecutive days. (Current law provides that a motorboat does not have to be registered and numbered in Indiana if the motorboat: (1) is legally registered in another state and has not been in Indiana for more than 60 consecutive days; or (2) for certain other reasons.)
Title
Motorboat registration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-22 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 83 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 171 |
2013-05-07 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-04-25 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-04-22 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 562: yeas 83, nays 3 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 269: yeas 49 and nays 0 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Amendment 1 (Mishler), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senators Kruse and Tallian added as cosponsors |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-02-25 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2013-02-11 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Mishler and Yoder |
2013-02-11 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2013-02-11 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 103: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2013-02-07 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-02-05 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-02-04 | House | Representative Pelath added as coauthor |
2013-01-22 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources |
2013-01-22 | House | Authored by Representative Eberhart |