IN HB1563 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 289
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 289
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Natural resources matters.
Title
Natural resources matters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-25 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 2 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - House - Conference committee report 2 : adopted by the House (Y: 78 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 42 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House - Amendment 3 (Wesco), failed (Y: 32 N: 62 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-04-24 - House - House - Conference committee report 2 : adopted by the House (Y: 78 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 42 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House - Amendment 3 (Wesco), failed (Y: 32 N: 62 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 289 |
2013-05-11 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-04-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee report 2 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 533: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2013-04-24 | House | Conference committee report 2 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 588: yeas 80, nays 17 |
2013-04-24 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee report 1 : withdrawn |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 508: yeas 42, nays 8 |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Banks, Arnold, Mishler and Bray |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Senate conferee appointed: Yoder and R. Young |
2013-04-09 | House | House advisors appointed: McMillin, Stemler and Dvorak |
2013-04-09 | House | House conferees appointed: Eberhart and Kersey |
2013-04-09 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 351: yeas 40 and nays 9 |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senator Banks added as cosponsor |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Senator Mishler added as cosponsor |
2013-02-25 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2013-02-12 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Yoder and R. Young |
2013-02-12 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2013-02-12 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 119: yeas 96, nays 2 |
2013-02-11 | House | Amendment 3 (Wesco), failed; Roll Call 90: yeas 32, nays 62 |
2013-02-11 | House | Amendment 1 (Lehman), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-02-11 | House | Amendment 2 (McMillin), withdrawn |
2013-02-11 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-02-05 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2013-02-04 | House | Representatives Kersey and VanNatter added as coauthors |
2013-01-22 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources |
2013-01-22 | House | Coauthored by Representative Arnold |
2013-01-22 | House | Authored by Representative Eberhart |