IN HB1561 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-25 - Third Reading: call withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Annexation and service agreements. Provides the following for annexations for which an annexation ordinance is adopted after June 30, 2015: (1) Provides that the annexation fiscal plan is similar to plans required for local government mergers and reorganizations. (2) Prohibits the fiscal plan from being amended after a remonstrance petition is filed, unless the amendment is consented to by remonstrators.(3) Requires a municipality to conduct an outreach program to inform citizens about a proposed annexation. (4) Allows remonstrators who prevail at a remonstrance hearing to recover expenses incurred in filing the remonstrance, including appeal costs and reasonable attorney's fees, in

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Annexation and service agreements. Provides the following for annexations for which an annexation ordinance is adopted after June 30, 2015: (1) Provides that the annexation fiscal plan is similar to plans required for local government mergers and reorganizations. (2) Prohibits the fiscal plan from being amended after a remonstrance petition is filed, unless the amendment is consented to by remonstrators.(3) Requires a municipality to conduct an outreach program to inform citizens about a proposed annexation. (4) Allows remonstrators who prevail at a remonstrance hearing to recover expenses incurred in filing the remonstrance, including appeal costs and reasonable attorney's fees, in

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-19 - House - House - Amendment #2 (Goodin) prevailed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-25HouseThird Reading: call withdrawn
2015-02-19HouseAmendment #2 (Goodin) prevailed; Roll Call 184: yeas 92, nays 0
2015-02-19HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2015-02-17HouseRepresentative Truitt added as coauthor
2015-02-17HouseRepresentative Negele added as author
2015-02-17HouseRepresentative Truitt removed as author
2015-02-17HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-01-20HouseRepresentative Mahan added as coauthor
2015-01-20HouseRepresentative Truitt removed as coauthor
2015-01-20HouseRepresentative Truitt added as author
2015-01-20HouseRepresentative Mahan removed as author
2015-01-20HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
2015-01-20HouseCoauthored by Representative Truitt
2015-01-20HouseAuthored by Representative Mahan

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback