IN HB1561 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 117
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 117
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
1977 fund membership.
Title
1977 fund membership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-19 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House - Amendment 1 (Davis), failed (Y: 21 N: 74 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
House - House - Roll Call 527 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House - Amendment 1 (Davis), failed (Y: 21 N: 74 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
House - House - Roll Call 527 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 117 |
2013-04-29 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-04-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-04-16 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 527: yeas 92, nays 0 |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 297: yeas 49 and nays 0 |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Senator Buck added as second sponsor |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Senator Buck removed as cosponsor |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Senator Tallian added as cosponsor |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senator Buck added as cosponsor |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-02-25 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor |
2013-02-04 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Head |
2013-02-04 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2013-02-04 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 63: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2013-01-31 | House | Amendment 1 (Davis), failed; Roll Call 47: yeas 21, nays 74 |
2013-01-31 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-01-29 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-01-22 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2013-01-22 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Ober, Wesco and Moed |
2013-01-22 | House | Authored by Representative Harman |