IN HB1558 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Public Law 243
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Public Law 243
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Science of reading. Defines "science of reading". Requires the state board of education (state board) in collaboration with the department of education (department) to prepare and submit a report regarding the alignment of science of reading concepts in IREAD. Requires a school corporation and charter school to report certain information regarding reading and writing curricula, remedial programs, and administrative contact information on the school corporation's or charter school's website. Provides that, beginning with the 2024-2025 school year, a superintendent, advisory committee, or governing body or the equivalent for a charter school: (1) shall adopt curriculum or supplemental materials for reading that are aligned with the science of reading and to the student's reading proficiency; and (2) may not adopt curriculum or supplemental materials for reading that are based on the three-cueing model. Requires the department to develop guidelines for science of reading integration into teacher preparation programs. Makes changes to the education law concerning the science of reading and teacher preparation and licensing requirements. Requires a school corporation to differentiate the amount of salary increases or increments for teachers who possess a required literacy endorsement. Removes a requirement that a discussion regarding teacher supplemental payment be held. Requires the state board to establish and require literacy endorsements for certain individuals first licensed after June 30, 2025. Provides that, not later than July 1, 2024, the state board shall adopt rules to establish early childhood content area licenses and required endorsements. Requires the department to publish an advisory list of science of reading curricula on the department's website. Provides that the state board and the department: (1) shall implement academic standards for reading that are aligned with the science of reading and developmentally appropriate based on student need; and (2) may not implement an academic standard for reading based on the three-cueing model.
Title
Science of reading.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-24 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | House | Public Law 243 |
2023-05-04 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2023-05-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2023-04-24 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 482: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2023-04-20 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Senators Crane and Doriot added as cosponsors |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 448: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Ford J.D.) failed; voice vote |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Senator Ford Jon added as cosponsor |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Senator Hunley added as cosponsor |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-03-01 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2023-02-22 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2023-02-21 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Freeman, Rogers, Raatz |
2023-02-21 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 191: yeas 91, nays 0 |
2023-02-20 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-02-16 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-01-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2023-01-26 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-01-24 | House | Representative Davis M added as coauthor |
2023-01-19 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2023-01-19 | House | Authored by Representative Teshka |
2023-01-19 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Behning and McGuire |