IN HB1555 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Public Law 87
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Public Law 87
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Military family occupational licenses. Provides that a military service applicant who has held an occupational license, certification, registration, or permit (license) in another jurisdiction for at least one year may qualify for an Indiana license. Removes the requirement that an applicant have a license for at least two of the five years preceding the date of the application. Provides that an applicant may not have a complaint or investigation pending before an occupational licensing board (board) that relates to unprofessional conduct or an alleged crime. Provides that a military member's dependent may apply for an occupational license under the same conditions as a military member's spouse. Requires the board to issue a license to an applicant upon application based on work experience in another state if certain conditions are met. Provides that the requirement that a nonresident is entitled to the same rights and subject to the same obligations as required of a resident who is issued a license by a board does not apply to a member of the military, a military spouse, or a dependent who applies for a real estate broker or appraiser license. Allows an applicant to appeal a final determination of the board. Makes a technical correction.
Title
Military family occupational licenses.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris May [R] | Rep. Steve Bartels [R] | Rep. Joanna King [R] | Rep. Maureen Bauer [D] |
Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Sen. Chris Garten [R] | Sen. Scott Baldwin [R] | Sen. Susan Glick [R] |
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | House | Public Law 87 |
2023-04-20 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2023-04-03 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Senator Glick added as cosponsor |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Senator Baldwin added as cosponsor |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 258: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Senator Garten added as second sponsor |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2023-02-27 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology |
2023-02-08 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2023-02-07 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 94: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2023-02-07 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Koch |
2023-02-07 | House | Representative Bauer M added as coauthor |
2023-02-06 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-02-02 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-01-23 | House | Representative King J added as coauthor |
2023-01-19 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2023-01-19 | House | Authored by Representative May |
2023-01-19 | House | Coauthored by Representative Bartels |