IN HB1552 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Public Law 59
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Public Law 59
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Reserve police officer continuing education. Allows a county, city, or town law enforcement agency to provide continuing education to appointed police reserve officers.
Title
Reserve police officer continuing education. Allows a county, city, or town law enforcement agency to provide continuing education to appointed police reserve officers.
Sponsors
Rep. Peggy Mayfield [R] | Rep. Steve Bartels [R] | Rep. Kevin Mahan [R] | Rep. Karlee Macer [D] |
Sen. Jack Sandlin [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Public Law 59 |
2019-04-18 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2019-04-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 380: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2019-03-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2019-02-26 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2019-02-25 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Sandlin |
2019-02-25 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 292: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2019-02-21 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-02-19 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2019-01-29 | House | Representative Macer added as coauthor |
2019-01-17 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety |
2019-01-17 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Bartels and Mahan |
2019-01-17 | House | Authored by Representative Mayfield |