IN HB1548 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Public Law 140
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Public Law 140
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Medicaid advisory committee. Adds appointments by the Indiana Association of Health Plans and the Indiana Primary Care Association to the Medicaid advisory committee (committee). Increases the membership of the committee by providing for the president pro tempore of the senate and the speaker of the house of representatives to each appoint six members (instead of one member). Provides that three of the members appointed by the president pro tempore and three of the members appointed by the speaker shall serve on a standing fiscal subcommittee of the committee. Requires that three of the members appointed by the speaker of the house of representatives and three of the members appointed by the president pro tempore be members of the minority party. Requires the committee to create a standing fiscal subcommittee. Provides that subcommittees of the committee may convene as often as needed. Requires the committee to review, study, and make advisory recommendations concerning certain subjects before July 1, 2021.
Title
Medicaid advisory committee. Adds appointments by the Indiana Association of Health Plans and the Indiana Primary Care Association to the Medicaid advisory committee (committee). Increases the membership of the committee by providing for the president pro tempore of the senate and the speaker of the house of representatives to each appoint six members (instead of one member). Provides that three of the members appointed by the president pro tempore and three of the members appointed by the speaker shall serve on a standing fiscal subcommittee of the committee. Requires that three of the members appointed by the speaker of the house of representatives and three of the members appointed by the president pro tempore be members of the minority party. Requires the committee to create a standing fiscal subcommittee. Provides that subcommittees of the committee may convene as often as needed. Requires the committee to review, study, and make advisory recommendations concerning certain subjects before July 1, 2021.
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Kirchhofer [R] | Rep. Robin Shackleford [D] | Sen. Vaneta Becker [R] | Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] |
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-16 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | House | Public Law 140 |
2019-04-29 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2019-04-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2019-04-16 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 540: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2019-04-16 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 432: yeas 46, nays 2 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as second sponsor |
2019-03-05 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2019-02-20 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Becker |
2019-02-20 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 249: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2019-02-19 | House | Amendment #2 (Kirchhofer) prevailed; voice vote |
2019-02-19 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2019-02-14 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-02-07 | House | Representative Shackleford added as coauthor |
2019-01-17 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2019-01-17 | House | Authored by Representative Kirchhofer |