IN HB1547 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Public Law 139
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Consent to pregnancy services of a minor. Allows a minor who is at least 16 years of age and: (1) pregnant; (2) in labor; or (3) postpartum; to consent to health care concerning the pregnancy, delivery, and pospartum care. Requires a health care provider to make a reasonable effort to contact a minor's parent or guardian before or at the initial appointment before providing treatment and document in writing each attempt to contact the parent or guardian. Requires the health care provider to act in the manner that is in the best interests of the minor and the fetus. Requires the health care provider to make an additional attempt to contact the parent or guardian of a minor for consent during specified times in the provision of care. Makes technical corrections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Consent to pregnancy services of a minor. Allows a minor who is at least 16 years of age and: (1) pregnant; (2) in labor; or (3) postpartum; to consent to health care concerning the pregnancy, delivery, and pospartum care. Requires a health care provider to make a reasonable effort to contact a minor's parent or guardian before or at the initial appointment before providing treatment and document in writing each attempt to contact the parent or guardian. Requires the health care provider to act in the manner that is in the best interests of the minor and the fetus. Requires the health care provider to make an additional attempt to contact the parent or guardian of a minor for consent during specified times in the provision of care. Makes technical corrections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29HousePublic Law 139
2019-04-29HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-18SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-18HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-10HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 480: yeas 92, nays 0
2019-04-10HouseMotion to concur filed
2019-04-03SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2019-04-02SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 379: yeas 48, nays 0
2019-04-01SenateAmendment #1 (Leising) prevailed; voice vote
2019-04-01SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-03-28SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-25SenateSenator Rogers added as cosponsor
2019-03-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2019-02-20HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-19HouseRepresentatives Manning, Shackleford, Clere added as coauthors
2019-02-19HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Leising and Becker
2019-02-19HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 238: yeas 95, nays 0
2019-02-18HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-14HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-17HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2019-01-17HouseAuthored by Representative Kirchhofer

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1547/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/d/3/b/2d3b8a4f/HB1547.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/4/e/f/44efca66/HB1547.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/7/f/5/37f56e03/HB1547.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/f/1/2/ef128cd3/HB1547.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/b/1/2/9b12c5b6/HB1547.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/f/3/e/6f3ec2ca/HB1547.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/f/b/a/6fbaa912/HB1547.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/f/2/f/ff2f4ffb/HB1547.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/d/c/4/4dc4b2a9/HB1547.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/7/7/4/f7742ed2/HB1547.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/a/6/2/2a624b10/HB1547.238.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/f/f/3/aff36b0a/HB1547.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/1/7/4/9174af51/HB1547.379.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/5/0/f/d50f15ac/HB1547.480.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback