IN HB1546 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-05 - Public Law 265
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prior authorization and Medicaid. Specifies that after December 31, 2020 the prior authorization for health care services statute applies to the risk based managed care Medicaid program. Requires, after December 31, 2020, that a Medicaid managed care organization use a standardized prior authorization form prescribed by the office of the secretary of family and social services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prior authorization and Medicaid. Specifies that after December 31, 2020 the prior authorization for health care services statute applies to the risk based managed care Medicaid program. Requires, after December 31, 2020, that a Medicaid managed care organization use a standardized prior authorization form prescribed by the office of the secretary of family and social services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-05HousePublic Law 265
2019-05-05HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-24SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-23HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-22HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 583: yeas 85, nays 0
2019-04-22HouseMotion to concur filed
2019-04-17SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2019-04-16SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 499: yeas 49, nays 0
2019-04-11SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-04-08SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2019-04-04SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-28SenateSenator Charbonneau added as second sponsor
2019-03-07SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2019-02-13HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-12HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Becker
2019-02-12HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 151: yeas 91, nays 0
2019-02-11HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-07HouseRepresentatives Schaibley and Shackleford added as coauthors
2019-02-07HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-17HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2019-01-17HouseAuthored by Representative Kirchhofer

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1546/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/4/1/7/64176529/HB1546.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/3/c/f/53cf9408/HB1546.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/7/f/1/37f11767/HB1546.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/0/d/7/a0d70549/HB1546.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/c/5/f/7c5fbc37/HB1546.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/8/d/5/d8d51608/HB1546.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/8/6/f/d86fca4d/HB1546.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/f/c/9/afc9925b/HB1546.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/e/c/8/bec8977f/HB1546.151.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/1/d/5/11d59ee0/HB1546.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/8/6/f/086f476d/HB1546.499.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/4/a/b/44abb203/HB1546.583.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback