IN HB1546 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-12 - Veto overridden by the Senate; Roll Call 2: yeas 34, nays 12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Makes numerous changes concerning the administration of the state gross retail tax, the adjusted gross income tax, the commercial vehicle excise tax, tax collection, penalties, and the registering and plating of certain commercial vehicles. Restores provisions repealed in 2012 concerning the deduction and credits provided to retail merchants with respect to prepaid sales taxes on gasoline and special fuel. Authorizes the disclosure of taxpayer information to a member of the general assembly or an employee of the house of representatives or the senate if the member or employee is acting on behalf of the taxpayer and certain conditions are met. Repeals obsolete provisions in the commercial vehicle excise tax law. Provides an alcoholic beverage excise tax credit for liquor or wine excise taxes paid in duplicate as a result of excise taxes being imposed both at the time the taxed goods are received and when the same goods are withdrawn from a storage facility. Requires the taxpayer to annually use an amount equal to the credit for capital expenditures to expand employment or assist in retaining employment within Indiana. Requires the department of state revenue to annually verify whether the capital expenditures made by the taxpayer comply with the requirement. Provides that the office of management and budget may enter into an offset agreement with the Secretary of the Treasury of the United States to participate in a reciprocal Treasury Offset Program under federal law. Provides certain exemptions for an out-of-state business that performs disaster emergency related work in Indiana. Specifies that a deceased veteran's surviving spouse is eligible for a veteran's property tax deduction if the deceased veteran satisfied the requirements for the deduction at the time of death and the surviving spouse owns the property at the time the deduction statement is filed. Specifies that the surviving spouse may provide the documentation necessary to establish that the deceased veteran qualified for the deduction at the time of death. Provides that the surviving spouse is entitled to the deduction regardless of whether the property for which the deduction is claimed was owned by the deceased veteran or the surviving spouse before the deceased veteran's death. Provides that a surviving spouse who was denied the deduction for the March 1, 2012, or March 1, 2013, assessment date is entitled to a refund of the property taxes paid with respect to the denied amount if the qualifying surviving spouse files a statement for the deduction before September 1, 2013. Allows veterans with qualifying disabilities who do not own certain types of taxable property to claim credits against the motor vehicle excise tax. Allows the surviving spouses of qualified veterans and World War I veterans who do not own those types of taxable property to claim the credits. Specifies that the amount of the credit is the lesser of the claimant's excise tax liability or $70. Provides that the maximum number of vehicles for which credits may be claimed is two. (Current law allows such veterans to apply any excess property tax deduction amount to the motor vehicle excise tax as a credit, but owning property is a requirement for claiming the property tax deduction and applying its excess to the excise tax.) Extends the period during which Jackson County may impose an additional 0.1% county adjusted gross income tax (CAGIT) rate to operate and maintain a jail and a juvenile detention center until 2024. Legalizes and validates taxes collected at the additional rate in Jackson County after June 30, 2011, and before July 1, 2013. Extends the period during which Pulaski County may impose an additional 0.3% county adjusted gross income tax (CAGIT) rate to operate and maintain a jail and justice center until 2021. Legalizes and validates taxes collected at the additional rate in Pulaski County after the eight years authorized by statute had elapsed and before July 1, 2013. Changes the maximum innkeeper's tax rate that may be imposed by the county council of Vigo County from 5% to 8%. Provides that the Indiana economic development corporation may designate not more than two new certified technology parks during any state fiscal year. Provides that the designation of a new certified technology park is subject to review by the budget committee and approval of the budget agency. Provides a procedure for a public utility to obtain a property tax credit for an overassessment of the public utility's distributable property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax administration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-26 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
House - House - Roll Call 02 (Y: 68 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-12SenateVeto overridden by the Senate; Roll Call 2: yeas 34, nays 12
2013-06-12HouseVeto overridden by the House; Roll Call 2: yeas 68, nays 23
2013-05-09HouseVetoed by the Governor
2013-05-03HouseSigned by the Speaker
2013-05-01SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2013-04-30SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2013-04-26SenateConference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 582: yeas 48, nays 1
2013-04-26SenateRules suspended
2013-04-26HouseConference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 642: yeas 98, nays 0
2013-04-26HouseRules suspended
2013-04-16SenateSenate advisors appointed: Skinner, Buck and Walker
2013-04-16SenateSenate conferee appointed: Hershman and Broden
2013-04-15HouseHouse advisors appointed: T. Brown, Slager, Pryor, Klinker and Stemler
2013-04-15HouseHouse conferees appointed: Turner and Porter
2013-04-11HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2013-04-10SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2013-04-10SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 450: yeas 47 and nays 3
2013-04-09SenateAmendment 1 (Hume), prevailed; voice vote
2013-04-09SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2013-04-08SenateSenator Broden added as cosponsor
2013-04-04SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-02-27SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
2013-02-25HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Hershman
2013-02-25HouseReferred to the Senate
2013-02-25HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 214: yeas 92, nays 0
2013-02-20HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-02-18HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-02-11HouseRepresentative Koch added as coauthor
2013-01-22HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2013-01-22HouseAuthored by Representative Turner

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.in.gov/apps/lsa/session/billwatch/billinfo?year=2013&session=1&request=getBill&doctype=HB&docno=1546
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/IN/IN1546.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/HB/HB1546.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/EH/EH1546.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/EH/EH1546.2.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/HE/HE1546.1.html
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Hrollcal/0214.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Srollcal/0450.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Srollcal/0582.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Hrollcal/0642.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Hrollcal/0002.PDF.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback