IN HB1545 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Public Law 138
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Public Law 138
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public health matters. Amends the definition of "food instrument" to state that a participant under the federal Women, Infants, and Children program uses an electronic benefit transfer card to obtain food. Requires the state department of health (department) to provide to the local vital records offices guidelines concerning the interpretation of the laws and the department's rules concerning vital statistics to assure uniform application of the state laws and rules. Removes expired language. Provides that if the Indiana birth registration system (IBRS) or the Indiana death registration system (IDRS) is unavailable for more than 48 hours, the state registrar may issue a notice that allows the filing of a paper record of a live birth, a death, or both. Provides that certain birth, stillborn, and death permanent records may be maintained by the IBRS and IDRS. Requires that a paper copy of the permanent record of a birth, stillborn, or death certificate be provided upon request by an individual. Allows the department to disclose identifiable vital statistics information to a legitimate researcher, if the researcher complies with certain requirements.
Title
Public health matters. Amends the definition of "food instrument" to state that a participant under the federal Women, Infants, and Children program uses an electronic benefit transfer card to obtain food. Requires the state department of health (department) to provide to the local vital records offices guidelines concerning the interpretation of the laws and the department's rules concerning vital statistics to assure uniform application of the state laws and rules. Removes expired language. Provides that if the Indiana birth registration system (IBRS) or the Indiana death registration system (IDRS) is unavailable for more than 48 hours, the state registrar may issue a notice that allows the filing of a paper record of a live birth, a death, or both. Provides that certain birth, stillborn, and death permanent records may be maintained by the IBRS and IDRS. Requires that a paper copy of the permanent record of a birth, stillborn, or death certificate be provided upon request by an individual. Allows the department to disclose identifiable vital statistics information to a legitimate researcher, if the researcher complies with certain requirements.
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Kirchhofer [R] | Rep. Shane Lindauer [R] | Rep. Robin Shackleford [D] | Rep. Rita Fleming [D] |
Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] | Sen. John Ruckelshaus [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | House | Public Law 138 |
2019-04-29 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2019-04-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2019-04-10 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 479: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2019-04-10 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 378: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senator Ruckelshaus added as second sponsor |
2019-02-27 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2019-02-01 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2019-01-31 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Charbonneau |
2019-01-31 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 80: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2019-01-29 | House | Representatives Lindauer, Shackleford, Fleming added as coauthors |
2019-01-28 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-01-24 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2019-01-17 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2019-01-17 | House | Authored by Representative Kirchhofer |