IN HB1545 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 288
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 288
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Various tax matters.
Title
Various tax matters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-27 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 62 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 79 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 62 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 79 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 288 |
2013-05-11 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-05-03 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 590: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2013-04-27 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-04-27 | House | Representative Heuer added as coauthor |
2013-04-26 | House | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 660: yeas 62, nays 26 |
2013-04-26 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-04-26 | House | Representative T. Brown added as conferee |
2013-04-26 | House | Representative T. Brown removed as House advisor |
2013-04-26 | House | Representative Pryor removed as conferee |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Holdman, Hume and Smith |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate conferee appointed: Hershman and Skinner |
2013-04-15 | House | House advisors appointed: T. Brown, Thompson, Niezgodski and Shackleford |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Turner and Pryor |
2013-04-11 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Senator Wyss added as cosponsor |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 449: yeas 49 and nays 1 |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Amendment 1 (Hershman), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-02-27 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2013-02-25 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Hershman |
2013-02-25 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2013-02-25 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 215: yeas 79, nays 14 |
2013-02-20 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-02-18 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-01-22 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2013-01-22 | House | Authored by Representative Turner |