IN HB1544 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Mental health center appropriation allotment. Amends the allotment of county funds to community mental health centers in Marion County to provide for a phased transition from a formula based on populations of service areas to a formula oriented toward numbers of enrolled consumers served. (Current law requires the allotment to be based upon the population residing in each service area.)
Title
Mental health center appropriation allotment. Amends the allotment of county funds to community mental health centers in Marion County to provide for a phased transition from a formula based on populations of service areas to a formula oriented toward numbers of enrolled consumers served. (Current law requires the allotment to be based upon the population residing in each service area.)
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Kirchhofer [R] | Rep. Todd Huston [R] | Rep. Robin Shackleford [D] | Sen. John Ruckelshaus [R] |
Sen. Jean Breaux [D] | Sen. Michael Crider [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2019-02-21 | House | Representative Shackleford added as coauthor |
2019-02-21 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Ruckelshaus, Breaux and Crider |
2019-02-21 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 259: yeas 97, nays 0 |
2019-02-20 | House | Representative Huston added as coauthor |
2019-02-20 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-02-18 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-01-17 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-01-17 | House | Authored by Representative Kirchhofer |