IN HB1544 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Mental health center appropriation allotment. Amends the allotment of county funds to community mental health centers in Marion County to provide for a phased transition from a formula based on populations of service areas to a formula oriented toward numbers of enrolled consumers served. (Current law requires the allotment to be based upon the population residing in each service area.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental health center appropriation allotment. Amends the allotment of county funds to community mental health centers in Marion County to provide for a phased transition from a formula based on populations of service areas to a formula oriented toward numbers of enrolled consumers served. (Current law requires the allotment to be based upon the population residing in each service area.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-02-22HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-21HouseRepresentative Shackleford added as coauthor
2019-02-21HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Ruckelshaus, Breaux and Crider
2019-02-21HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 259: yeas 97, nays 0
2019-02-20HouseRepresentative Huston added as coauthor
2019-02-20HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-18HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-17HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-01-17HouseAuthored by Representative Kirchhofer

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback