IN HB1543 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Public Law 179
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Inpatient addiction treatment. Provides that when determined by the treatment plan to be medically necessary, the office of Medicaid policy and planning shall provide coverage for inpatient detoxification using the American Society of Addiction Medicine Patient Placement Criteria.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Inpatient addiction treatment. Provides that when determined by the treatment plan to be medically necessary, the office of Medicaid policy and planning shall provide coverage for inpatient detoxification using the American Society of Addiction Medicine Patient Placement Criteria.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01HousePublic Law 179
2019-05-01HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-18SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-18HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-17SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2019-04-16SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 498: yeas 48, nays 0
2019-04-11SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-04-08SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2019-04-04SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-03-28SenateSenator Charbonneau added as second sponsor
2019-03-07SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2019-02-13HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-12HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Becker
2019-02-12HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 152: yeas 93, nays 0
2019-02-11HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-07HouseRepresentative Shackleford added as coauthor
2019-02-07HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-01-17HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2019-01-17HouseAuthored by Representative Kirchhofer

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1543/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/b/3/5/7b3588f3/HB1543.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/d/6/5/6d657cf4/HB1543.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/8/a/0/98a02f85/HB1543.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/a/a/5/0aa50ae8/HB1543.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/f/a/b/3fab7a27/HB1543.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/c/c/7/9cc760a0/HB1543.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/2/7/b/227b6fee/HB1543.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/4/4/0/5440d4a8/HB1543.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/4/2/5/f4250477/HB1543.152.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/9/0/4/c904ad01/HB1543.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/4/c/3/04c3d314/HB1543.498.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback