IN HB1541 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-23 - Referred to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Landlord-tenant relations. Eliminates the general restriction on the authority of a county, city, town, or township concerning regulation of landlord-tenant relationship matters not specifically described by state statute.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Landlord-tenant relations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House - Amendment #3 (Pierce) failed (Y: 28 N: 62 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-02-18 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Pierce) failed (Y: 26 N: 62 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2021-02-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-23HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-22HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Buck
2021-02-22HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 205: yeas 96, nays 0
2021-02-18HouseAmendment #3 (Pierce) failed; Roll Call 202: yeas 28, nays 62
2021-02-18HouseAmendment #1 (Pierce) failed; Roll Call 201: yeas 26, nays 62
2021-02-18HouseAmendment #2 (Pierce) motion withdrawn voice vote
2021-02-18HouseAmendment #4 (Manning) prevailed; voice vote
2021-02-18HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-02-16HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Manning

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1541/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/7/f/3/47f38c9b/HB1541.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/a/e/0/dae08fdc/HB1541.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/a/d/8/7ad88194/HB1541.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/3/1/0/f3106802/HB1541.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/b/2/2/3b22ed30/HB1541.03.ENGH.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/a/4/8/5a480e02/HB1541.02.COMH.AMH001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/3/c/7/b3c7d7db/HB1541.02.COMH.AMH002.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/3/3/8/d3381825/HB1541.02.COMH.AMH003.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/2/1/5/e215b6c5/HB1541.02.COMH.AMH004.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/d/d/a/1dda2b77/HB1541.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/8/b/5/d8b5a5fe/HB1541.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/0/b/4/80b4b32f/HB1541.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/1/7/6/2176c788/HB1541.03.ENGH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/5/0/c/750c439a/HB1541.03.ENGH.FN002.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/c/9/3/4c93026d/HB1541.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/c/4/f/4c4fa2c6/HB1541.201_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/6/e/8/46e85003/HB1541.202_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/c/1/9/ec196c6b/HB1541.205_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback