IN HB1541 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - First Reading: Referred to Committee on Commerce & Technology
Pending: Senate Commerce & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - First Reading: Referred to Committee on Commerce & Technology
Pending: Senate Commerce & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Enterprise zones. Provides that the fiscal body of a municipality may adopt a resolution renewing an enterprise zone for an additional five years after the date on which the enterprise zone is set to expire. Provides that new municipal enterprise zones may not be added after December 31, 2020. (Under current law, the board of the Indiana economic development corporation may not add any new municipal enterprise zones after December 31, 2015.) Amends the definition of "qualified investment" for purposes of an enterprise zone investment deduction after 2015 to include new information technology equipment, new research and development equipment, and
Title
Enterprise zones. Provides that the fiscal body of a municipality may adopt a resolution renewing an enterprise zone for an additional five years after the date on which the enterprise zone is set to expire. Provides that new municipal enterprise zones may not be added after December 31, 2020. (Under current law, the board of the Indiana economic development corporation may not add any new municipal enterprise zones after December 31, 2015.) Amends the definition of "qualified investment" for purposes of an enterprise zone investment deduction after 2015 to include new information technology equipment, new research and development equipment, and
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Dermody [R] | Rep. Randy Truitt [R] | Rep. Philip GiaQuinta [D] | Rep. Sheila Klinker [D] |
Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. John Broden [D] | Sen. James Arnold [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-28 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-24 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Committee on Commerce & Technology |
2015-02-19 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-02-17 | House | Senator Arnold added as third sponsor |
2015-02-17 | House | Senator Broden added as second sponsor |
2015-02-17 | House | Senator Kruse added as sponsor |
2015-02-17 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 173: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2015-02-16 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-02-12 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-29 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2015-01-29 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-20 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Commerce, Small Business and Economic Development |
2015-01-20 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Truitt, GiaQuinta, Klinker |
2015-01-20 | House | Authored by Representative Dermody |