IN HB1535 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on April 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-12 - Public Law 31
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on April 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-12 - Public Law 31
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Study of law enforcement training matters. Urges the legislative council to assign to the appropriate committee a study of: (1) possible sources of funding for new and existing law enforcement academies; (2) possible sources of funding for law enforcement officer training; (3) alternative sources of funding for law enforcement academies and officer training; (4) the sustainability of existing revenue streams responsible for funding law enforcement academies and officer training; (5) possible locations for new or relocated law enforcement academies; (6) the repurposing of existing facilities for use as law enforcement academies; (7) the leasing of existing facilities for use as
Title
Study of law enforcement training matters. Urges the legislative council to assign to the appropriate committee a study of: (1) possible sources of funding for new and existing law enforcement academies; (2) possible sources of funding for law enforcement officer training; (3) alternative sources of funding for law enforcement academies and officer training; (4) the sustainability of existing revenue streams responsible for funding law enforcement academies and officer training; (5) possible locations for new or relocated law enforcement academies; (6) the repurposing of existing facilities for use as law enforcement academies; (7) the leasing of existing facilities for use as
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-12 | House | Public Law 31 |
2017-04-12 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-04-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 381: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senator Niezgodski added as cosponsor |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senators Crider, Sandlin, Melton added as cosponsors |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senator Delph added as second sponsor |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-02-23 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2017-02-20 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Bray |
2017-02-20 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 148: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2017-02-16 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-02-14 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-01-31 | House | Representatives Lawson, Mahan, Karickhoff added as coauthors |
2017-01-18 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety |
2017-01-18 | House | Authored by Representative McNamara |