IN HB1532 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Public Law 61
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Department of child services reporting. Requires the department of child services (department) to annually submit to the general assembly a report providing specified information regarding cost reports submitted to the department by child caring institutions, group homes, child placing agencies, and private secure facilities. Requires the first such report submitted by the department to provide the specified information for the preceding four years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of child services reporting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-15HousePublic Law 61
2021-04-15HouseSigned by the Governor
2021-04-14SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-08SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-04-07HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-03-30SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2021-03-30SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2021-03-29SenateSenator Ford J.D. added as cosponsor
2021-03-29SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 281: yeas 49, nays 0
2021-03-25SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-03-22SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-02-23SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services
2021-02-09HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-08HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Grooms and Ford Jon
2021-02-08HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 94: yeas 89, nays 0
2021-02-04HouseRepresentatives Lauer and Jackson added as coauthors
2021-02-04HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-02-02HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs
2021-01-14HouseCoauthored by Representative Olthoff
2021-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative DeVon

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1532/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/4/2/4/9424e86d/HB1532.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/0/9/8/e098b6dd/HB1532.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/f/5/a/7f5a3ae8/HB1532.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/0/3/0/a0302bc7/HB1532.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/5/2/4/f5249597/HB1532.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/0/0/e/300efacc/HB1532.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/b/a/8/9ba87a33/HB1532.04.ENRS.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/d/8/8/fd884081/HB1532.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/7/2/d/672d4c1b/HB1532.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/9/f/3/a9f39e68/HB1532.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/3/f/3/23f32a47/HB1532.02.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/a/d/b/5adbc91d/HB1532.02.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/a/3/4/ca34f351/HB1532.02.COMH.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/e/d/6/0ed6664f/HB1532.03.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/e/e/f/eeefe355/HB1532.03.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/6/1/5/c6154263/HB1532.03.COMS.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/7/5/d/875d8a48/HB1532.04.ENRS.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/2/6/4/3264d972/HB1532.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/c/2/1/9c214d66/HB1532.94_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/8/4/b/784b9c60/HB1532.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/0/4/7/c047c7d3/HB1532.281_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback