IN HB1526 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Hazing. Provides that a postsecondary educational institution must develop an educational plan on hazing. Requires a postsecondary educational institution to report incidents of hazing on the postsecondary educational institution's Internet web site. Amends the elements and penalty levels for the offense of hazing. Provides that any person who actively directs or engages in an act of hazing which results in the injury of another person, shall, to the extent that the person can do so without danger or peril to self or others, give reasonable assistance to the injured person. Provides that failure to seek assistance, in no serious bodily injury, is a Class B misdemeanor. Provides that failure to seek assistance results in serious bodily injury the offense is a Level 6 felony. Provides that certain arguments are not a defense to hazing or contributory hazing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hazing. Provides that a postsecondary educational institution must develop an educational plan on hazing. Requires a postsecondary educational institution to report incidents of hazing on the postsecondary educational institution's Internet web site. Amends the elements and penalty levels for the offense of hazing. Provides that any person who actively directs or engages in an act of hazing which results in the injury of another person, shall, to the extent that the person can do so without danger or peril to self or others, give reasonable assistance to the injured person. Provides that failure to seek assistance, in no serious bodily injury, is a Class B misdemeanor. Provides that failure to seek assistance results in serious bodily injury the offense is a Level 6 felony. Provides that certain arguments are not a defense to hazing or contributory hazing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - House - Third reading (Y: 85 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-22HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-21HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Ruckelshaus, Bohacek and Lanane
2019-02-21HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 258: yeas 85, nays 13
2019-02-20HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-18HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-17HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2019-01-17HouseCoauthored by Representative Clere
2019-01-17HouseAuthored by Representative Austin

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback