IN HB1520 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-05 - Public Law 263
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-05 - Public Law 263
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Child support. Provides that the duty to support a child ceases when the child becomes 19 years of age unless the child is a full-time student in a secondary school. Provides that in order for child support to continue for a child who is: (1) 19 years of age or older; and (2) a full-time student in a secondary school; a parent or guardian of the child must file notice advising the court that the child continues or will continue to be enrolled in secondary school. Specifies requirements for the content and filing of the notice. Provides that if a party to the child support proceeding does not file an objection or request for a hearing within thirty (30) days after the party receives the notice, the court may, without holding a hearing, issue an order continuing child support through the date on which the child is expected to graduate. Provides that senior prosecuting attorneys include persons employed for at least eight years as a part-time deputy prosecuting attorney. Provides that senior prosecuting attorneys may prosecute criminal nonsupport cases.
Title
Child support. Provides that the duty to support a child ceases when the child becomes 19 years of age unless the child is a full-time student in a secondary school. Provides that in order for child support to continue for a child who is: (1) 19 years of age or older; and (2) a full-time student in a secondary school; a parent or guardian of the child must file notice advising the court that the child continues or will continue to be enrolled in secondary school. Specifies requirements for the content and filing of the notice. Provides that if a party to the child support proceeding does not file an objection or request for a hearing within thirty (30) days after the party receives the notice, the court may, without holding a hearing, issue an order continuing child support through the date on which the child is expected to graduate. Provides that senior prosecuting attorneys include persons employed for at least eight years as a part-time deputy prosecuting attorney. Provides that senior prosecuting attorneys may prosecute criminal nonsupport cases.
Sponsors
Rep. Philip GiaQuinta [D] | Rep. Lisa Beck [D] | Rep. Gerald Torr [R] | Rep. Wendy McNamara [R] |
Sen. Justin Busch [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Sen. Timothy Lanane [D] | Sen. Randall Head [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-22 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - Third reading (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - Third reading (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-05 | House | Public Law 263 |
2019-05-05 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2019-04-23 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2019-04-22 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 579: yeas 74, nays 0 |
2019-04-17 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 496: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-03-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-12 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2019-02-11 | House | Cosponsor: Senator Head |
2019-02-11 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Busch, Randolph Lonnie M and Lanane |
2019-02-11 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 135: yeas 89, nays 1 |
2019-02-07 | House | Representatives Torr and McNamara added as coauthors |
2019-02-07 | House | Amendment #1 (GiaQuinta) prevailed; voice vote |
2019-02-07 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2019-02-04 | House | Representative Beck added as coauthor |
2019-02-04 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2019-01-17 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-01-17 | House | Authored by Representative GiaQuinta |