IN HB1517 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Enrolled on March 20 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Returned to the House without amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Charity gaming. Repeals the current charity gaming article and replaces it with a reorganized and revised charity gaming article. Raises the prize limits for when a qualified organization is not required to obtain a license for an allowable activity. Consolidates the current license types into an annual activity license, single activity license, convention raffle license, and annual affiliate license. Creates an expedited application processing fee. Repeals the door prize limits and qualified drawings. Renames the comprehensive charity gaming license to the annual affiliate license. Revises fee tables for license renewals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Charity gaming. Repeals the current charity gaming article and replaces it with a reorganized and revised charity gaming article. Raises the prize limits for when a qualified organization is not required to obtain a license for an allowable activity. Consolidates the current license types into an annual activity license, single activity license, convention raffle license, and annual affiliate license. Creates an expedited application processing fee. Repeals the door prize limits and qualified drawings. Renames the comprehensive charity gaming license to the annual affiliate license. Revises fee tables for license renewals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 41 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2019-03-19SenateSenator Leising added as cosponsor
2019-03-19SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 295: yeas 41, nays 7
2019-03-18SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2019-03-18SenateSenator Ford Jon added as cosponsor
2019-03-18SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-03-14SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-03-12SenateSenator Houchin added as second sponsor
2019-03-07SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
2019-02-19HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-18HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Alting
2019-02-18HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 199: yeas 95, nays 2
2019-02-14HouseAmendment #1 (Boy) prevailed; voice vote
2019-02-14HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-02-11HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-28HouseRepresentatives Clere, Mayfield, Moed added as coauthors
2019-01-24HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
2019-01-24HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-17HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
2019-01-17HouseAuthored by Representative Smaltz

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1517/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/2/e/4/52e4d3b2/HB1517.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/6/e/1/66e18d41/HB1517.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/c/a/7/aca7217f/HB1517.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/9/8/4/898417be/HB1517.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/2/2/0/5220ff01/HB1517.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/2/0/e/020ee3e8/HB1517.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/d/f/a/5dfae8a4/HB1517.04.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/6/6/5/e6656275/HB1517.04.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/5/c/f/e5cf546d/HB1517.05.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/6/4/e/a64e46bd/HB1517.05.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/8/6/0/3860ff26/HB1517.06.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/a/8/7/2a87a113/HB1517.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/4/3/e/343e6de5/HB1517.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/9/5/2/b952a32a/HB1517.199.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/5/4/c/354caa95/HB1517.04.ENGH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/9/6/8/5968600e/HB1517.295.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback