IN HB1516 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - First Reading: Referred to Committee on Elections
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

County assessors. Provides that a candidate for county assessor who held the office on May 1 of the election year must have attained the certification of a level three assessor-appraiser before taking office. Provides that a candidate for county assessor who did not hold the office on May 1 of the election year must have attained the certification of a level two assessor-appraiser before taking office.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County assessors. Provides that a candidate for county assessor who held the office on May 1 of the election year must have attained the certification of a level three assessor-appraiser before taking office. Provides that a candidate for county assessor who did not hold the office on May 1 of the election year must have attained the certification of a level two assessor-appraiser before taking office.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 68 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House Committee on Elections and Apportionment - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-24SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Committee on Elections
2015-02-05HouseReferred to the Senate
2015-02-03HouseSenator Schneider added as sponsor
2015-02-03HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 75: yeas 68, nays 27
2015-02-02HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-01-29HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2015-01-20HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment
2015-01-20HouseAuthored by Representative Smith M

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback