IN HB1515 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-04 - First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor
Pending: Senate Pensions and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Exposure risk diseases. Adds any variant of severe acute respiratory syndrome (SARS), including coronavirus disease (COVID-19), to the list of diseases considered an exposure risk disease for purposes of emergency and public safety employee death and disability presumed in the line of duty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exposure risk diseases.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor
2021-02-23HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-22HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Ford Jon, Baldwin, Tallian
2021-02-22HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 208: yeas 95, nays 0
2021-02-18HouseAmendment #1 (Olthoff) prevailed; voice vote
2021-02-18HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-02-17HouseRepresentative Frye added as coauthor
2021-02-16HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety
2021-01-14HouseCoauthored by Representatives Morris and Lauer
2021-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Judy

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1515/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/5/5/5/f5550695/HB1515.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/3/1/e/d31eb5dc/HB1515.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/7/e/a/67ea5499/HB1515.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/5/1/0/45100f42/HB1515.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/f/6/5/af650408/HB1515.03.ENGH.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/2/7/7/82774980/HB1515.02.COMH.AMH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/a/a/3/6aa3e9d4/HB1515.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/3/a/1/73a1c897/HB1515.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/3/6/1/f361a5f0/HB1515.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/9/9/5/79956a66/HB1515.03.ENGH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/c/0/e/5c0e4cbf/HB1515.03.ENGH.FN002.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/0/1/a/901a7dac/HB1515.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/4/7/c/847c5718/HB1515.208_H.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback