IN HB1514 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-23 - First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
Pending: Senate Education and Career Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

School accountability. Provides that, before July 1, 2024, the state board of education (state board) shall establish a compilation of longitudinal data, which shall be known as a "dashboard", indicating school performance success in various selected and enumerated program areas. Provides that the performance of a school's students on the statewide assessment program test and other criterion referenced benchmark assessments recommended by the department of education and approved by the state board are the primary and majority means of assessing a school's improvement. (Current law provides that the performance of a school's students on the statewide assessment program test and other assessments recommended by the department of education and approved by the state board are the primary and majority means of assessing a school's improvement.) Provides that the state board may assign each domain, indicator, or measure used to assess school performance a separate and distinct category or designation. Repeals provisions that: (1) provide consequences for failing schools; (2) provide consequences for failing charter schools or choice scholarship schools; and (3) authorize the establishment of turnaround academies. Provides that the state board shall assign to a school or school corporation (including adult high schools) a "null" or "no letter grade" for the 2020-2021 school year. Makes conforming and technical amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School accountability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-11 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-23SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2021-02-22SenateSenator Ford J.D. added as cosponsor
2021-02-12HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-11HouseRepresentatives McNamara and Smith, V. added as coauthors
2021-02-11HouseRepresentatives McNamara and Smith, V. removed as coauthors
2021-02-11HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Raatz, Buchanan, Crane
2021-02-11HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 113: yeas 94, nays 0
2021-02-09HouseRepresentative Smith, V. added as coauthor
2021-02-08HouseRepresentative Behning added as coauthor
2021-02-08HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-02-04HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2021-01-14HouseCoauthored by Representative McNamara
2021-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Cook

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1514/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/f/0/5/7f05ec45/HB1514.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/7/a/4/37a4bb2c/HB1514.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/8/4/7/78471c5a/HB1514.02.COMH.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/7/d/3/67d3f76d/HB1514.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/9/d/0/99d05379/HB1514.01.INTR.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/d/b/b/bdbbc110/HB1514.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/5/1/0/65103578/HB1514.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/0/2/4/8024587e/HB1514.02.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/d/9/a/2d9a6690/HB1514.02.COMH.FN003.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/0/5/8/e0582c9b/HB1514.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/2/9/a/229a3cb9/HB1514.113_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback