IN HB1508 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-13 - Representative Lawson added as coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-13 - Representative Lawson added as coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans affairs issues. Requires the state lottery commission to adopt rules to establish a scratch off game to benefit Indiana veterans. Deposits revenue from sales of tickets for the scratch off game into the veterans service officer fund, the veterans service officer training fund, and the veterans disability clinic fund. Requires a part of local income taxes to be withheld from cities and counties that fail to enforce accreditation and reaccreditation requirements for city and county veterans service officers. Requires notification from the director of the department of veterans affairs to county and city executives concerning noncompliance of veterans service
Title
Veterans affairs issues. Requires the state lottery commission to adopt rules to establish a scratch off game to benefit Indiana veterans. Deposits revenue from sales of tickets for the scratch off game into the veterans service officer fund, the veterans service officer training fund, and the veterans disability clinic fund. Requires a part of local income taxes to be withheld from cities and counties that fail to enforce accreditation and reaccreditation requirements for city and county veterans service officers. Requires notification from the director of the department of veterans affairs to county and city executives concerning noncompliance of veterans service
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Judy [R] | Rep. Karlee Macer [D] | Rep. Dennis Zent [R] | Rep. Robert Morris [R] |
Rep. Linda Lawson [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-08 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-13 | House | Representative Lawson added as coauthor |
2017-02-13 | House | Rule 105.1 suspended |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2017-02-09 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-02-02 | House | Representative Morris added as coauthor |
2017-01-24 | House | Representatives Macer and Zent added as coauthors |
2017-01-18 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy |
2017-01-18 | House | Authored by Representative Judy |