IN HB1505 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Public Law 68
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Public Law 68
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sale of nonsurplus municipal water utility property. Amends the procedures for the sale or disposition of nonsurplus municipally owned water, wastewater, or combined water and wastewater utility property as follows: (1) Provides that the municipal legislative body shall hold the required hearing on the sale or disposition not later than 90 days (instead of 45 days under current law) after the return of the appraisal concerning the property. (2) Provides that the legislative body may adopt an ordinance providing for the sale or disposition not less than 30 days or more than 60 days after the date of the required
Title
Sale of nonsurplus municipal water utility property. Amends the procedures for the sale or disposition of nonsurplus municipally owned water, wastewater, or combined water and wastewater utility property as follows: (1) Provides that the municipal legislative body shall hold the required hearing on the sale or disposition not later than 90 days (instead of 45 days under current law) after the return of the appraisal concerning the property. (2) Provides that the legislative body may adopt an ordinance providing for the sale or disposition not less than 30 days or more than 60 days after the date of the required
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-20 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House Committee on Local Government - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House Committee on Local Government - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-27 | House | Public Law 68 |
2015-04-27 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-04-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-20 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 506: yeas 98, nays 0 |
2015-04-15 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 403: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Senator Ford added as second sponsor |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senator Eckerty added as sponsor |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senator Head removed as sponsor |
2015-02-24 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2015-02-10 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-02-09 | House | Senator Head added as sponsor |
2015-02-09 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 102: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2015-02-05 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-02-02 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-20 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2015-01-20 | House | Authored by Representative VanNatter |