IN HB1500 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Public Law 106
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Public Law 106
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Kinship care navigator report. Requires the department of child services to annually issue a report to the general assembly concerning the kinship care navigator program.
Title
Kinship care navigator report. Requires the department of child services to annually issue a report to the general assembly concerning the kinship care navigator program.
Sponsors
Rep. Vanessa Summers [D] | Rep. Ryan Lauer [R] | Rep. Matthew Lehman [R] | Rep. John Bartlett [D] |
Sen. Vaneta Becker [R] | Sen. J.D. Ford [D] | Sen. Greg Taylor [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | Public Law 106 |
2019-04-25 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2019-03-28 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 275: yeas 45, nays 1 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2019-03-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2019-02-18 | House | Representative Bartlett added as coauthor |
2019-02-18 | House | Representative Lehman added as coauthor |
2019-02-18 | House | Representative Lauer added as coauthor |
2019-02-18 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Becker, Ford J.D. and Taylor G |
2019-02-18 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 198: yeas 97, nays 0 |
2019-02-14 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-02-12 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-01-16 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs |
2019-01-16 | House | Authored by Representative Summers |