IN HB1498 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Representative Hostettler added as coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Representative Hostettler added as coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Publication of local government notices. Allows a political subdivision to publish legal notices on a legal notice web site instead of in a newspaper. Establishes requirements regarding availability and accessibility of a legal notice web site. Requires a political subdivision to designate an official responsible for the electronic publication of legal notices, if the political subdivision publishes legal notices electronically. Provides that if a political subdivision does not have an official web site, legal notices may be published on an official web site of the county government. Establishes requirements for the duration of the posting of a legal notice and proof of posting. Provides that a towing service acting as an agent of a government agency that provides the notice required to dispose of abandoned vehicles or parts is subject to the same public notice advertising rates as a governmental agency.
Title
Publication of local government notices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-08 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 44 NV: 8 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-02-02 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Representative Hostettler added as coauthor |
2021-02-08 | House | Third reading: failed for lack of constitutional majority; Roll Call 93: yeas 46, nays 45 |
2021-02-04 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-02-02 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-01-14 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform |
2021-01-14 | House | Authored by Representative Miller D |