IN HB1496 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Public Law 270
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Alcohol matters. Provides that after May 14, 2017, a restaurant may not sell carryout unless at least 60% of its gross retail income from alcoholic beverage sales is derived from sales of alcoholic beverages consumed on the premises. Makes the following exceptions to the gross retail income requirements for sale of carryout: (1) Exempts retailer's permits issued to a city market, marina, state park, golf course, hotel, resort hotel, social or fraternal club, or restaurant operated by a microbrewer. (2) Provides that a restaurant initially issued or transferred a retailer's permit before November 1, 2016, is not required to comply

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcohol matters. Provides that after May 14, 2017, a restaurant may not sell carryout unless at least 60% of its gross retail income from alcoholic beverage sales is derived from sales of alcoholic beverages consumed on the premises. Makes the following exceptions to the gross retail income requirements for sale of carryout: (1) Exempts retailer's permits issued to a city market, marina, state park, golf course, hotel, resort hotel, social or fraternal club, or restaurant operated by a microbrewer. (2) Provides that a restaurant initially issued or transferred a retailer's permit before November 1, 2016, is not required to comply

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-21 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 85 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-02HousePublic Law 270
2017-05-02HouseSigned by the Governor
2017-04-27SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2017-04-27HouseSigned by the Speaker
2017-04-26SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2017-04-21HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 547: yeas 84, nays 14
2017-04-21SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 523: yeas 43, nays 6
2017-04-21SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2017-04-21HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2017-04-12HouseRepresentative Judy added as advisor
2017-04-12SenateSenate advisors appointed: Messmer, Lanane, Boots, Sandlin and Merritt
2017-04-12SenateSenate conferees appointed: Alting and Tallian
2017-04-11HouseHouse advisors appointed: Schaibley, Clere, Lehman, Austin, Brown C, Macer and Stemler
2017-04-11HouseHouse conferees appointed: Smaltz and GiaQuinta
2017-04-10HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2017-04-10HouseMotion to dissent filed
2017-04-06SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2017-04-06SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 425: yeas 40, nays 8
2017-04-05SenateSenator Messmer added as second sponsor
2017-04-05SenateAmendment #2 (Alting) prevailed; voice vote
2017-04-05SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-04-03SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2017-04-03SenateSenator Stoops added as cosponsor
2017-03-30SenateSenator Taylor G added as cosponsor
2017-03-30SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-03-01SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
2017-02-28HouseReferred to the Senate
2017-02-27HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Alting
2017-02-27HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 227: yeas 88, nays 4
2017-02-23HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2017-02-21HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-02-14HouseRepresentative Lehman added as coauthor
2017-02-06HouseRepresentative GiaQuinta added as coauthor
2017-01-26HouseRepresentative Clere added as coauthor
2017-01-18HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
2017-01-18HouseAuthored by Representative Smaltz

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2017/bills/house/1496/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/9/3/9/89390ac8/HB1496.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/c/c/e/0ccee9dd/HB1496.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/e/0/5/be0564cc/HB1496.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/f/3/b/ef3b7110/HB1496.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/9/e/6/59e673a2/HB1496.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/c/7/e/9c7ee16e/HB1496.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/f/2/5/8f25b6e4/HB1496.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/4/4/c/d44c321d/HB1496.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/8/e/2/c8e276b6/HB1496.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/b/b/0/fbb03bd6/HB1496.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/b/3/f/7b3fe1e3/HB1496.227.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/3/8/3/f3839ed4/HB1496.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/0/c/7/00c702ff/HB1496.425.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/b/e/0/6be0a97a/HB1496.523.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/5/1/9/75191566/HB1496.547.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback