IN HB1494 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Senator Glick removed as second sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Regulation of confined feeding operations. Amends the law on confined feeding operations (CFOs, which include any confined feeding of at least 300 cattle, 600 swine or sheep, 30,000 fowl, or 500 horses). Repeals the statute requiring a person to obtain the "prior approval" of the department of environmental management (IDEM) before constructing or operating a CFO. Provides instead that a person must obtain a permit from IDEM before constructing or operating a CFO. Requires a permit amendment before: (1) construction of a replacement manure storage facility that would not increase the CFO's manure storage capacity; (2) a change that would

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulation of confined feeding operations. Amends the law on confined feeding operations (CFOs, which include any confined feeding of at least 300 cattle, 600 swine or sheep, 30,000 fowl, or 500 horses). Repeals the statute requiring a person to obtain the "prior approval" of the department of environmental management (IDEM) before constructing or operating a CFO. Provides instead that a person must obtain a permit from IDEM before constructing or operating a CFO. Requires a permit amendment before: (1) construction of a replacement manure storage facility that would not increase the CFO's manure storage capacity; (2) a change that would

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 66 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-13SenateSenator Glick removed as second sponsor
2017-03-01SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure
2017-02-28HouseReferred to the Senate
2017-02-27HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Messmer and Glick
2017-02-27HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 243: yeas 66, nays 25
2017-02-23HouseRepresentatives Gutwein and Goodin added as coauthors
2017-02-22HouseAmendment #1 (Wolkins) prevailed; voice vote
2017-02-22HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-02-16HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-01-18HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs
2017-01-18HouseAuthored by Representative Wolkins

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback